Assembly
|
09/12/2019
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 4.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2019
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2019
|
August 21 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/13/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2019
|
(Received at desk July 17 pursuant to JR 61(a)(10)).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (July 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2019
|
June 26 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2019
|
Referred to Com. on U. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2019
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 7. Page 1030.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2019
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2019
|
Set for hearing May 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 2. Page 524.) (April 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2019
|
Set for hearing April 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2019
|
Referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2019
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2019
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|