|
01/13/2020
|
Veto sustained.
|
|
|
|
01/13/2020
|
Stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/13/2019
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/13/2019
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/19/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2019
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2881.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2019
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2019
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3321.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2019
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2019
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2019
|
Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2019
|
August 28 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/13/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (July 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on G.O. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2019
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1277.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1102.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2019
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2019
|
May 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2019
|
Set for hearing May 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 904.) (May 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2019
|
Set for hearing May 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2019
|
April 24 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2019
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2019
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2019
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2019
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|