California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB538 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 16, 2019

Amended

Bill September 6, 2019
Bill August 13, 2019
Bill March 28, 2019