|
07/30/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 152, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
07/30/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/19/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/11/2019
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2058.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2019
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/08/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2569.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/06/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/05/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 4).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2019
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2019
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1009.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 906.) (April 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2019
|
Set for hearing April 30.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2019
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2019
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2019
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2019
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|