California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB544 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2019

Enrolled

Bill July 15, 2019

Chaptered

Bill July 30, 2019

Amended

Bill June 5, 2019
Bill April 22, 2019
Bill March 27, 2019