|
07/30/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 137, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
07/30/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/19/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/11/2019
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/11/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2627.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/05/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (July 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2019
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2019
|
Referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2019
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1001.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 968.) (May 6).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2019
|
Set for hearing May 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2019
|
April 22 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2019
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 332.) (March 12).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2019
|
Set for hearing March 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2019
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/07/2019
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2019
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/03/2019
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|