California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB62 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 3, 2019

Enrolled

Bill July 15, 2019

Chaptered

Bill July 30, 2019

Amended

Bill April 3, 2019
Bill March 19, 2019
Bill February 25, 2019