Senate
|
06/18/2020
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2020
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2020
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 70. Noes 2. Page 4890.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2020
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2020
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2020
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2020
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2020
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2020
|
Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2020
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2020
|
Assembly Rule 56 suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2020
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. pursuant to Assembly Rule 97.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2020
|
From inactive file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2020
|
Assembly Rule 78 suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2019
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Bonta.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 6.) (August 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/09/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (July 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/06/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on C. & C. and TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2019
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 923.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 842.) (April 24).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2019
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E., U. & C. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 656.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2019
|
Set for hearing April 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and E., U. & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2019
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2019
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2019
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|