|
09/24/2020
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 130, Statutes of 2020.
|
|
|
|
09/24/2020
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2020
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2020
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5282.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2020
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2020
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (August 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/27/2020
|
July 27 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2020
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/30/2020
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3167.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2020
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2020
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3141.) (January 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2020
|
Set for hearing January 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2019
|
May 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2019
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2019
|
May 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2019
|
Set for hearing May 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 770.) (April 22).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2019
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2019
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2019
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2019
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2019
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|