California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB653 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2020

Chaptered

Bill September 24, 2020

Amended

Bill January 23, 2020
Bill April 25, 2019
Bill April 22, 2019
Bill March 27, 2019