Assembly
|
09/11/2019
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2019
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2019
|
August 14 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2019
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2019
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1271.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1089.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2019
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2019
|
April 8 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2019
|
Set for hearing April 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 384.) (March 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2019
|
Set for hearing March 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2019
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/08/2019
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|