|
10/10/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 723, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
10/10/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2019
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 63. Noes 13. Page 2960.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 4.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/09/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (July 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/21/2019
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 6. Page 1155.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2019
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2019
|
Set for hearing May 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 800.) (April 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2019
|
Set for hearing April 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 3. Noes 1. Page 654.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2019
|
Set for hearing April 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2019
|
Re-referred to Coms. on L., P.E. & R. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2019
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2019
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2019
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2019
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|