California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB688 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 5, 2019

Chaptered

Bill October 10, 2019

Amended

Bill April 25, 2019
Bill March 27, 2019