California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB690 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 13, 2019

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2019

Amended

Bill September 6, 2019
Bill August 12, 2019
Bill June 25, 2019
Bill April 29, 2019
Bill March 27, 2019