|
10/13/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 870, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
10/13/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/19/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2019
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 51. Noes 21. Page 3430.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (June 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/06/2019
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2019
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 1331.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2019
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2019
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2019
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2019
|
Set for hearing May 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 800.) (April 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2019
|
Set for hearing April 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2019
|
April 30 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2019
|
Set for hearing April 30.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2019
|
Re-referred to Coms. on JUD. and APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2019
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2019
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2019
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2019
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|