California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB707 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 13, 2019

Chaptered

Bill October 13, 2019

Amended

Bill May 20, 2019
Bill April 30, 2019
Bill April 11, 2019
Bill March 27, 2019