|
10/11/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 761, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/18/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2019
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 10. Page 2841.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2019
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 59. Noes 17. Page 3260.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2019
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2019
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 4.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2019
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2019
|
June 26 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2019
|
Referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2019
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 1242.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 1086.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2019
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2019
|
April 8 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2019
|
Set for hearing April 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 332.) (March 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2019
|
Set for hearing March 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2019
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/04/2018
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/03/2018
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|