Senate | 05/11/2020 | May 14 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 05/08/2020 | Set for hearing May 14. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2020 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. | ||
Senate | 03/19/2020 | March 31 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 03/13/2020 | Set for hearing March 31. | ||
Senate | 01/22/2020 | Referred to Com. on E., U. & C. | ||
Senate | 01/15/2020 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 14. | ||
Senate | 01/14/2020 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |