LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2019-2020 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB890
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SB890
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2019-2020 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB890
Action History
Senate
05/22/2020
May 22 hearing: Testimony taken. Hearing postponed by committee.
Senate
05/15/2020
Set for hearing May 22.
Senate
03/11/2020
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
Senate
02/06/2020
Referred to Com. on JUD.
Senate
01/28/2020
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 27.
Senate
01/27/2020
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.