Senate
|
09/01/2020
|
Ordered to inactive file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2020
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5496.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2020
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2020
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2020
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2020
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2020
|
August 18 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2020
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/30/2020
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/28/2020
|
July 28 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/27/2020
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2019
|
July 3 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/21/2019
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1162.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1087.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2019
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2019
|
April 29 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2019
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 712.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2019
|
Set for hearing April 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2019
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/04/2018
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/03/2018
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|