California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB9 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 3, 2018

Amended

Bill August 26, 2020
Bill August 25, 2020
Bill August 3, 2020
Bill July 13, 2020
Bill April 3, 2019