Senate
|
09/01/2020
|
Ordered to inactive file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2020
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 44. Noes 15. Page 5454.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2020
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2020
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2020
|
Amendments by Assembly Member Kiley tabled on motion by Assembly Member Calderon. (Ayes 54. Noes 17. Page 5169.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/30/2020
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (July 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/28/2020
|
July 28 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/27/2020
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2020
|
Referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2020
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 11. Page 3864.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2020
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2020
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3767.) (June 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2020
|
Set for hearing June 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2020
|
June 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2020
|
Set for hearing June 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2020
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2020
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 3583.) (May 22).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2020
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2020
|
Set for hearing May 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2020
|
Re-referred to Coms. on JUD. and APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2020
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2020
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2020
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2020
|
March 31 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2020
|
Set for hearing March 31.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2020
|
Referred to Com. on HOUSING.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2020
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2020
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|