California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB915 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 3, 2020

Amended

Bill August 24, 2020
Bill July 27, 2020
Bill June 18, 2020
Bill May 29, 2020
Bill May 13, 2020
Bill April 15, 2020
Bill March 5, 2020