|
09/18/2020
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 111, Statutes of 2020.
|
|
|
|
09/18/2020
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2020
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 6:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2020
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 66. Noes 5. Page 5171.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2020
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/27/2020
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (July 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/08/2020
|
July 13 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2020
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2020
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3684.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2020
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2020
|
Set for hearing June 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2020
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2020
|
June 1 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2020
|
Set for hearing June 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2020
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3559.) (May 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2020
|
Set for hearing May 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2020
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2020
|
Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2020
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2020
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|