LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2019-2020 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB970
Draft Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB970
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2019-2020 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB970
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
February 11, 2020
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
August 25, 2020
Compare
Chaptered
Bill
September 18, 2020
Compare
Amended
Bill
May 29, 2020
Compare
Bill
May 11, 2020
Compare
Bill
March 17, 2020
Compare