Assembly
|
08/24/2020
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2020
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2020
|
Assembly Rule 63 suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2020
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 4.) (August 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2020
|
August 18 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2020
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/05/2020
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 4.) (August 4).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/27/2020
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2020
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2020
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 11. Page 3874.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2020
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2020
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3768.) (June 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2020
|
Set for hearing June 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2020
|
June 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2020
|
Set for hearing June 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2020
|
Hearing rescheduled due to Capitol closure.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2020
|
Set for hearing June 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2020
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 3533.) (May 13).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2020
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2020
|
Set for hearing May 13 in HEALTH pending receipt.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2020
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2020
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2020
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2020
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|