California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB977 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 11, 2020

Amended

Bill August 24, 2020
Bill August 6, 2020
Bill July 27, 2020
Bill June 19, 2020
Bill May 19, 2020
Bill March 16, 2020