Assembly
|
08/20/2020
|
August 20 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2020
|
August 18 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2020
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/10/2020
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (August 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/27/2020
|
July 29 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2020
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2020
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3816.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2020
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2020
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3768.) (June 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2020
|
Set for hearing June 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2020
|
June 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2020
|
Set for hearing June 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2020
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3596.) (May 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2020
|
Set for hearing May 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2020
|
Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2020
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2020
|
March 24 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2020
|
Set for hearing March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2020
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2020
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2020
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|