1 | | - | Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 15 CHAPTER 41 Relative to Women and Girls in STEM Week. [ Filed with Secretary of State April 23, 2019. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 15, Chang. Women and Girls in STEM Week.This measure would designate April 7, 2019, to April 13, 2019, inclusive, as Women and Girls in STEM Week and would encourage all citizens and community organizations to support the observance of Californias Women and Girls in STEM Week by encouraging and celebrating women in the STEM fields.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, Science, technology, engineering, and mathematics (STEM) are critical fields for the success of Californias economy; and WHEREAS, Many of the fastest growing occupations in the United States require some form of expertise in the areas of STEM; andWHEREAS, STEM careers represent some of the highest paying positions in any field, thereby providing desirable career opportunities and real pathways out of poverty; andWHEREAS, Preparing students for the STEM workforce is essential to fulfilling the demands of our 21st century, innovation-focused economy; andWHEREAS, A significant gender gap exists in the participation of STEM disciplines and the STEM workforce; andWHEREAS, Women earn nearly 60 percent of bachelors degrees, but are underrepresented in STEM-related college degrees, especially in the computer sciences and engineering fields; andWHEREAS, According to the United States Census Bureau, while women make up nearly one-half of the working population, they only represent 26 percent of the STEM workforce; andWHEREAS, Women represented 34 percent of computer occupations in 1990, but that number declined to 27 percent by 2011; andWHEREAS, Women in STEM professions earn one-third more than women in non-STEM-related occupations; andWHEREAS, In California, the gender disparities among STEM fields are similar if not more pronounced. Only 15 percent of engineering graduates in California are women and only 15 percent of engineers in the workforce are women; andWHEREAS, Despite underrepresentation in the STEM fields, there are many California female leaders who represent the STEM community and serve as role models for young girls preparing for STEM careers; andWHEREAS, Todays women leaders in STEM stand on the shoulders of innovators that came before them, such as Grace Murray Hopper, a pioneer in her field who is credited for inventing the first computer language compiler; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature encourages all citizens and community organizations to support the observance of Californias Women and Girls in STEM Week by encouraging and celebrating women in the STEM fields; and be it furtherResolved, That the Legislature declares April 7, 2019, to April 13, 2019, inclusive, as Women and Girls in STEM Week; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|
| 1 | + | Enrolled April 18, 2019 Passed IN Senate March 28, 2019 Passed IN Assembly April 11, 2019 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 15Introduced by Senator Chang(Coauthor: Senator Mitchell)(Coauthors: Assembly Members Aguiar-Curry, Bauer-Kahan, Bigelow, Bloom, Boerner Horvath, Bonta, Brough, Burke, Calderon, Carrillo, Cervantes, Chau, Chen, Choi, Chu, Cooper, Cunningham, Dahle, Daly, Diep, Eggman, Flora, Fong, Friedman, Gabriel, Gallagher, Cristina Garcia, Gipson, Gloria, Gonzalez, Gray, Grayson, Holden, Irwin, Jones-Sawyer, Kalra, Kamlager-Dove, Kiley, Lackey, Limn, Maienschein, Mathis, Mayes, Medina, Melendez, Mullin, Muratsuchi, Nazarian, ODonnell, Patterson, Petrie-Norris, Quirk, Quirk-Silva, Ramos, Rendon, Reyes, Luz Rivas, Robert Rivas, Rodriguez, Blanca Rubio, Salas, Santiago, Smith, Mark Stone, Ting, Voepel, Waldron, Weber, Wicks, and Wood)February 15, 2019 Relative to Women and Girls in STEM Week. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 15, Chang. Women and Girls in STEM Week.This measure would designate April 7, 2019, to April 13, 2019, inclusive, as Women and Girls in STEM Week and would encourage all citizens and community organizations to support the observance of Californias Women and Girls in STEM Week by encouraging and celebrating women in the STEM fields.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, Science, technology, engineering, and mathematics (STEM) are critical fields for the success of Californias economy; and WHEREAS, Many of the fastest growing occupations in the United States require some form of expertise in the areas of STEM; andWHEREAS, STEM careers represent some of the highest paying positions in any field, thereby providing desirable career opportunities and real pathways out of poverty; andWHEREAS, Preparing students for the STEM workforce is essential to fulfilling the demands of our 21st century, innovation-focused economy; andWHEREAS, A significant gender gap exists in the participation of STEM disciplines and the STEM workforce; andWHEREAS, Women earn nearly 60 percent of bachelors degrees, but are underrepresented in STEM-related college degrees, especially in the computer sciences and engineering fields; andWHEREAS, According to the United States Census Bureau, while women make up nearly one-half of the working population, they only represent 26 percent of the STEM workforce; andWHEREAS, Women represented 34 percent of computer occupations in 1990, but that number declined to 27 percent by 2011; andWHEREAS, Women in STEM professions earn one-third more than women in non-STEM-related occupations; andWHEREAS, In California, the gender disparities among STEM fields are similar if not more pronounced. Only 15 percent of engineering graduates in California are women and only 15 percent of engineers in the workforce are women; andWHEREAS, Despite underrepresentation in the STEM fields, there are many California female leaders who represent the STEM community and serve as role models for young girls preparing for STEM careers; andWHEREAS, Todays women leaders in STEM stand on the shoulders of innovators that came before them, such as Grace Murray Hopper, a pioneer in her field who is credited for inventing the first computer language compiler; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature encourages all citizens and community organizations to support the observance of Californias Women and Girls in STEM Week by encouraging and celebrating women in the STEM fields; and be it furtherResolved, That the Legislature declares April 7, 2019, to April 13, 2019, inclusive, as Women and Girls in STEM Week; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|