Senate | 03/14/2019 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 17, Statutes of 2019. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2019 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/07/2019 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 03/07/2019 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 604.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 03/04/2019 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 4). | ||
Assembly | 03/04/2019 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 02/28/2019 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 02/28/2019 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 267.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 02/27/2019 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 02/20/2019 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |