California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR17 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 17 CHAPTER 17 Relative to Read Across America Day. [ Filed with Secretary of State March 14, 2019. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 17, Leyva. Read Across America Day.This measure would recognize March 1, 2019, as Read Across America Day, and would call upon all Californians to observe this day by participating in appropriate ceremonies and activities.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, Reading is the building block to learning and the foundation for future success; andWHEREAS, In 1998, the National Education Association celebrated the Read Across America campaign to raise awareness about the importance of reading; andWHEREAS, The California Teachers Association celebrates Read Across America and the positive impact it has made in the schools and the State of California; andWHEREAS, Read Across America is a national celebration of reading that promotes literacy, reading, and adult involvement in the education of pupils, and will be celebrated on March 1 in honor of Dr. Seusss birthday; andWHEREAS, To celebrate the joy of reading, pupils, parents, teachers, sports figures, celebrities, firefighters, and business and community leaders are taking part in Read Across America events throughout the nation; andWHEREAS, On March 1, 2019, the National Education Association, the California Teachers Association, local schools, libraries, bookstores, businesses, and other community organizations will commemorate Read Across America Day; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature recognizes March 1, 2019, as Read Across America Day, and calls upon all Californians to observe this day by participating in appropriate ceremonies and activities; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.
1+Enrolled March 11, 2019 Passed IN Senate February 28, 2019 Passed IN Assembly March 07, 2019 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 17Introduced by Senators Leyva and WilkFebruary 20, 2019 Relative to Read Across America Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 17, Leyva. Read Across America Day.This measure would recognize March 1, 2019, as Read Across America Day, and would call upon all Californians to observe this day by participating in appropriate ceremonies and activities.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, Reading is the building block to learning and the foundation for future success; andWHEREAS, In 1998, the National Education Association celebrated the Read Across America campaign to raise awareness about the importance of reading; andWHEREAS, The California Teachers Association celebrates Read Across America and the positive impact it has made in the schools and the State of California; andWHEREAS, Read Across America is a national celebration of reading that promotes literacy, reading, and adult involvement in the education of pupils, and will be celebrated on March 1 in honor of Dr. Seusss birthday; andWHEREAS, To celebrate the joy of reading, pupils, parents, teachers, sports figures, celebrities, firefighters, and business and community leaders are taking part in Read Across America events throughout the nation; andWHEREAS, On March 1, 2019, the National Education Association, the California Teachers Association, local schools, libraries, bookstores, businesses, and other community organizations will commemorate Read Across America Day; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature recognizes March 1, 2019, as Read Across America Day, and calls upon all Californians to observe this day by participating in appropriate ceremonies and activities; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.
22
3- Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 17 CHAPTER 17 Relative to Read Across America Day. [ Filed with Secretary of State March 14, 2019. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 17, Leyva. Read Across America Day.This measure would recognize March 1, 2019, as Read Across America Day, and would call upon all Californians to observe this day by participating in appropriate ceremonies and activities.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO
3+ Enrolled March 11, 2019 Passed IN Senate February 28, 2019 Passed IN Assembly March 07, 2019 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 17Introduced by Senators Leyva and WilkFebruary 20, 2019 Relative to Read Across America Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 17, Leyva. Read Across America Day.This measure would recognize March 1, 2019, as Read Across America Day, and would call upon all Californians to observe this day by participating in appropriate ceremonies and activities.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO
4+
5+ Enrolled March 11, 2019 Passed IN Senate February 28, 2019 Passed IN Assembly March 07, 2019
6+
7+Enrolled March 11, 2019
8+Passed IN Senate February 28, 2019
9+Passed IN Assembly March 07, 2019
10+
11+ CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION
412
513 Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 17
6-CHAPTER 17
14+
15+Introduced by Senators Leyva and WilkFebruary 20, 2019
16+
17+Introduced by Senators Leyva and Wilk
18+February 20, 2019
719
820 Relative to Read Across America Day.
9-
10- [ Filed with Secretary of State March 14, 2019. ]
1121
1222 LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST
1323
1424 ## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST
1525
1626 SCR 17, Leyva. Read Across America Day.
1727
1828 This measure would recognize March 1, 2019, as Read Across America Day, and would call upon all Californians to observe this day by participating in appropriate ceremonies and activities.
1929
2030 This measure would recognize March 1, 2019, as Read Across America Day, and would call upon all Californians to observe this day by participating in appropriate ceremonies and activities.
2131
2232 ## Digest Key
2333
2434 ## Bill Text
2535
2636 WHEREAS, Reading is the building block to learning and the foundation for future success; and
2737
2838 WHEREAS, In 1998, the National Education Association celebrated the Read Across America campaign to raise awareness about the importance of reading; and
2939
3040 WHEREAS, The California Teachers Association celebrates Read Across America and the positive impact it has made in the schools and the State of California; and
3141
3242 WHEREAS, Read Across America is a national celebration of reading that promotes literacy, reading, and adult involvement in the education of pupils, and will be celebrated on March 1 in honor of Dr. Seusss birthday; and
3343
3444 WHEREAS, To celebrate the joy of reading, pupils, parents, teachers, sports figures, celebrities, firefighters, and business and community leaders are taking part in Read Across America events throughout the nation; and
3545
3646 WHEREAS, On March 1, 2019, the National Education Association, the California Teachers Association, local schools, libraries, bookstores, businesses, and other community organizations will commemorate Read Across America Day; now, therefore, be it
3747
3848 Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature recognizes March 1, 2019, as Read Across America Day, and calls upon all Californians to observe this day by participating in appropriate ceremonies and activities; and be it further
3949
4050 Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.