Senate | 05/02/2019 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 47, Statutes of 2019. | ||
Senate | 05/02/2019 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:30 p.m. | ||
Senate | 04/25/2019 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 04/25/2019 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1363.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 04/22/2019 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 22). | ||
Assembly | 04/10/2019 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/08/2019 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2019 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 592.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2019 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 03/25/2019 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2019 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |