Senate | 05/31/2019 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 67, Statutes of 2019. | ||
Senate | 05/31/2019 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2019 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2019 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1831.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2019 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 16). | ||
Assembly | 05/06/2019 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/02/2019 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/02/2019 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 915.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2019 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/02/2019 | Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 04/02/2019 | Read third time and amended. | ||
Senate | 03/27/2019 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2019 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |