1 | | - | Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 25 CHAPTER 67Relative to California Peace Officers Memorial Day. [ Filed with Secretary of State May 31, 2019. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 25, Galgiani. California Peace Officers Memorial Day.This measure would designate Monday, May 6, 2019, as California Peace Officers Memorial Day, urge all Californians to use that day to honor California peace officers, and recognize specified California peace officers who were killed in defense of their communities.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, Monday, May 6, 2019, is California Peace Officers Memorial Day, a day Californians observe in commemoration of those noble officers who have tragically sacrificed their lives in the line of duty; andWHEREAS, Although California citizens are indebted to our California peace officers each day of the week, we make particular note of their bravery and dedication and we share in their losses on California Peace Officers Memorial Day; andWHEREAS, California peace officers have a job second in importance to none, and it is a job that is as difficult and dangerous as it is important; andWHEREAS, The peace officers of California have worked dutifully and selflessly on behalf of the people of this great state, regardless of the peril or hazard to themselves; andWHEREAS, By the enforcement of our laws, these same officers have safeguarded the lives and property of the citizens of California and have given their full measure to ensure these citizens the right to be free from crime and violence; andWHEREAS, Special ceremonies and observations on behalf of California peace officers provide all Californians with the opportunity to appreciate the heroic individuals who have dedicated their lives to preserving public safety; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature recognizes Californias peace officers who were killed in defense of their communities in 2018:Deputy Sheriff Steven E. Belanger, Los Angeles County Sheriffs Department, End of Watch: February 6, 2018.Officer Greggory Casillas, Pomona Police Department, End of Watch: March 9, 2018. Deputy Sheriff Ryan D. Zirkle, Marin County Sheriffs Office, End of Watch: March 15, 2018. Officer Kirk A. Griess, California Highway Patrol, Solano Area Office, End of Watch: August 10, 2018.Deputy Sheriff Mark V. Stasyuk, Sacramento County Sheriffs Department, End of Watch: September 17, 2018. Sergeant Ronald L. Helus, Ventura County Sheriffs Office, End of Watch: November 8, 2018.Deputy Sheriff Tony Hinostroza, III, Stanislaus County Sheriffs Department, End of Watch: November 25, 2018.Corporal Ronil Singh, Newman Police Department, End of Watch: December 26, 2018; and be it furtherResolved, That the Legislature also recognizes Californias peace officers who were killed in defense of their communities in prior years, but who are not yet enrolled:Deputy Sheriff Henry V. Snowbelt, Lake County Sheriffs Department, End of Watch: October 2, 1937.Deputy City Marshal Maurice W. Halloran, Vernon Police Department, End of Watch: November 15, 1913; and be it further Resolved, That the Legislature designates Monday, May 6, 2019, as California Peace Officers Memorial Day, and urges all Californians to remember those individuals who have given their lives for our safety and express appreciation to those who continue to dedicate themselves to making California a safer place in which to live and raise our families; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|
| 1 | + | Enrolled May 28, 2019 Passed IN Senate May 02, 2019 Passed IN Assembly May 22, 2019 Amended IN Senate April 02, 2019 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 25Introduced by Senator Galgiani(Coauthors: Senators Bates, Beall, Caballero, Chang, Dodd, Glazer, Grove, Hertzberg, Jackson, Leyva, McGuire, Monning, Nielsen, Pan, Portantino, Roth, Stern, Stone, Wieckowski, Wiener, and Wilk)(Coauthors: Assembly Members Aguiar-Curry, Boerner Horvath, Cervantes, Choi, Cooper, Dahle, Flora, Frazier, Cristina Garcia, Gray, Lackey, Levine, Limn, Mathis, McCarty, Ramos, Robert Rivas, Rodriguez, and Blanca Rubio)March 14, 2019Relative to California Peace Officers Memorial Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 25, Galgiani. California Peace Officers Memorial Day.This measure would designate Monday, May 6, 2019, as California Peace Officers Memorial Day, urge all Californians to use that day to honor California peace officers, and recognize specified California peace officers who were killed in defense of their communities.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, Monday, May 6, 2019, is California Peace Officers Memorial Day, a day Californians observe in commemoration of those noble officers who have tragically sacrificed their lives in the line of duty; andWHEREAS, Although California citizens are indebted to our California peace officers each day of the week, we make particular note of their bravery and dedication and we share in their losses on California Peace Officers Memorial Day; andWHEREAS, California peace officers have a job second in importance to none, and it is a job that is as difficult and dangerous as it is important; andWHEREAS, The peace officers of California have worked dutifully and selflessly on behalf of the people of this great state, regardless of the peril or hazard to themselves; andWHEREAS, By the enforcement of our laws, these same officers have safeguarded the lives and property of the citizens of California and have given their full measure to ensure these citizens the right to be free from crime and violence; andWHEREAS, Special ceremonies and observations on behalf of California peace officers provide all Californians with the opportunity to appreciate the heroic individuals who have dedicated their lives to preserving public safety; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature recognizes Californias peace officers who were killed in defense of their communities in 2018:Deputy Sheriff Steven E. Belanger, Los Angeles County Sheriffs Department, End of Watch: February 6, 2018.Officer Greggory Casillas, Pomona Police Department, End of Watch: March 9, 2018. Deputy Sheriff Ryan D. Zirkle, Marin County Sheriffs Office, End of Watch: March 15, 2018. Officer Kirk A. Griess, California Highway Patrol, Solano Area Office, End of Watch: August 10, 2018.Deputy Sheriff Mark V. Stasyuk, Sacramento County Sheriffs Department, End of Watch: September 17, 2018. Sergeant Ronald L. Helus, Ventura County Sheriffs Office, End of Watch: November 8, 2018.Deputy Sheriff Tony Hinostroza, III, Stanislaus County Sheriffs Department, End of Watch: November 25, 2018.Corporal Ronil Singh, Newman Police Department, End of Watch: December 26, 2018; and be it furtherResolved, That the Legislature also recognizes Californias peace officers who were killed in defense of their communities in prior years, but who are not yet enrolled:Deputy Sheriff Henry V. Snowbelt, Lake County Sheriffs Department, End of Watch: October 2, 1937.Deputy City Marshal Maurice W. Halloran, Vernon Police Department, End of Watch: November 15, 1913; and be it further Resolved, That the Legislature designates Monday, May 6, 2019, as California Peace Officers Memorial Day, and urges all Californians to remember those individuals who have given their lives for our safety and express appreciation to those who continue to dedicate themselves to making California a safer place in which to live and raise our families; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|