Senate | 06/20/2019 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 89, Statutes of 2019. | ||
Senate | 06/20/2019 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:45 p.m. | ||
Senate | 06/13/2019 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 06/13/2019 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2278.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2019 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 6). | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2019 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2019 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/28/2019 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1332.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/22/2019 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/14/2019 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |