Senate | 05/15/2019 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 58, Statutes of 2019. | ||
Senate | 05/15/2019 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | ||
Senate | 05/09/2019 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2019 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1593.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 05/02/2019 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 2). | ||
Assembly | 02/11/2019 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 02/07/2019 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 02/07/2019 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 149.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 02/06/2019 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 01/28/2019 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |