California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR9 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 9 CHAPTER 58 Relative to the Lunar New Year celebration. [ Filed with Secretary of State May 15, 2019. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 9, Pan. Lunar New Year Celebration. This measure would recognize the Lunar New Year celebration on February 5, 2019.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, February 5, 2019, will mark the beginning of the Lunar New Year, which is celebrated in many Asian communities around the world, including in the United States and especially in California; andWHEREAS, California is home to nearly 6 million Asian and Pacific Islander Americans of Bangladeshi, Cambodian, Chinese, Filipino, Hmong, Indian, Indonesian, Iu-Mien, Japanese, Korean, Laotian, Malaysian, Pakistani, Sri Lankan, Taiwanese, and Vietnamese descent; andWHEREAS, The Asian and Pacific Islander American communities have contributed to the social, cultural, civic, economic, and academic success of the state; andWHEREAS, The Lunar New Year is predominantly celebrated by the 2.5 million Chinese, Korean, and Vietnamese residents of California; andWHEREAS, The Lunar New Year is universally celebrated by these communities as a time to renew family ties and to start the new year with a clean slate; andWHEREAS, This Lunar New Year (4717) is the Year of the Pig; andWHEREAS, The celebration of the Lunar New Year in communities throughout California illustrates the states rich cultural history and commitment to racial, religious, and cultural diversity; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Members join Asian and Pacific Islander communities throughout the state in celebrating February 5, 2019, as the beginning of the Lunar New Year and extend best wishes for a peaceful and prosperous Lunar New Year to all Californians; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.
1+Enrolled May 10, 2019 Passed IN Senate February 07, 2019 Passed IN Assembly May 09, 2019 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 9Introduced by Senator PanJanuary 28, 2019 Relative to the Lunar New Year celebration. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 9, Pan. Lunar New Year Celebration. This measure would recognize the Lunar New Year celebration on February 5, 2019.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, February 5, 2019, will mark the beginning of the Lunar New Year, which is celebrated in many Asian communities around the world, including in the United States and especially in California; andWHEREAS, California is home to nearly 6 million Asian and Pacific Islander Americans of Bangladeshi, Cambodian, Chinese, Filipino, Hmong, Indian, Indonesian, Iu-Mien, Japanese, Korean, Laotian, Malaysian, Pakistani, Sri Lankan, Taiwanese, and Vietnamese descent; andWHEREAS, The Asian and Pacific Islander American communities have contributed to the social, cultural, civic, economic, and academic success of the state; andWHEREAS, The Lunar New Year is predominantly celebrated by the 2.5 million Chinese, Korean, and Vietnamese residents of California; andWHEREAS, The Lunar New Year is universally celebrated by these communities as a time to renew family ties and to start the new year with a clean slate; andWHEREAS, This Lunar New Year (4717) is the Year of the Pig; andWHEREAS, The celebration of the Lunar New Year in communities throughout California illustrates the states rich cultural history and commitment to racial, religious, and cultural diversity; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Members join Asian and Pacific Islander communities throughout the state in celebrating February 5, 2019, as the beginning of the Lunar New Year and extend best wishes for a peaceful and prosperous Lunar New Year to all Californians; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.
22
3- Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 9 CHAPTER 58 Relative to the Lunar New Year celebration. [ Filed with Secretary of State May 15, 2019. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 9, Pan. Lunar New Year Celebration. This measure would recognize the Lunar New Year celebration on February 5, 2019.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO
3+ Enrolled May 10, 2019 Passed IN Senate February 07, 2019 Passed IN Assembly May 09, 2019 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 9Introduced by Senator PanJanuary 28, 2019 Relative to the Lunar New Year celebration. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 9, Pan. Lunar New Year Celebration. This measure would recognize the Lunar New Year celebration on February 5, 2019.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO
4+
5+ Enrolled May 10, 2019 Passed IN Senate February 07, 2019 Passed IN Assembly May 09, 2019
6+
7+Enrolled May 10, 2019
8+Passed IN Senate February 07, 2019
9+Passed IN Assembly May 09, 2019
10+
11+ CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION
412
513 Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 9
6-CHAPTER 58
14+
15+Introduced by Senator PanJanuary 28, 2019
16+
17+Introduced by Senator Pan
18+January 28, 2019
719
820 Relative to the Lunar New Year celebration.
9-
10- [ Filed with Secretary of State May 15, 2019. ]
1121
1222 LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST
1323
1424 ## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST
1525
1626 SCR 9, Pan. Lunar New Year Celebration.
1727
1828 This measure would recognize the Lunar New Year celebration on February 5, 2019.
1929
2030 This measure would recognize the Lunar New Year celebration on February 5, 2019.
2131
2232 ## Digest Key
2333
2434 ## Bill Text
2535
2636 WHEREAS, February 5, 2019, will mark the beginning of the Lunar New Year, which is celebrated in many Asian communities around the world, including in the United States and especially in California; and
2737
2838 WHEREAS, California is home to nearly 6 million Asian and Pacific Islander Americans of Bangladeshi, Cambodian, Chinese, Filipino, Hmong, Indian, Indonesian, Iu-Mien, Japanese, Korean, Laotian, Malaysian, Pakistani, Sri Lankan, Taiwanese, and Vietnamese descent; and
2939
3040 WHEREAS, The Asian and Pacific Islander American communities have contributed to the social, cultural, civic, economic, and academic success of the state; and
3141
3242 WHEREAS, The Lunar New Year is predominantly celebrated by the 2.5 million Chinese, Korean, and Vietnamese residents of California; and
3343
3444 WHEREAS, The Lunar New Year is universally celebrated by these communities as a time to renew family ties and to start the new year with a clean slate; and
3545
3646 WHEREAS, This Lunar New Year (4717) is the Year of the Pig; and
3747
3848 WHEREAS, The celebration of the Lunar New Year in communities throughout California illustrates the states rich cultural history and commitment to racial, religious, and cultural diversity; now, therefore, be it
3949
4050 Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Members join Asian and Pacific Islander communities throughout the state in celebrating February 5, 2019, as the beginning of the Lunar New Year and extend best wishes for a peaceful and prosperous Lunar New Year to all Californians; and be it further
4151
4252 Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.