Senate | 09/09/2019 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 142, Statutes of 2019. | ||
Senate | 09/09/2019 | (Corrected September 5). | ||
Senate | 09/09/2019 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | ||
Senate | 09/03/2019 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 11. Page 2436.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/26/2019 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | ||
Assembly | 08/26/2019 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 49. Noes 24. Page 2847.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 07/02/2019 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (July 1). | ||
Assembly | 06/17/2019 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2019 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 04/22/2019 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2019 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 745.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2019 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 3. Page 657.) (April 9). | ||
Senate | 03/22/2019 | Set for hearing April 9. | ||
Senate | 03/20/2019 | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Senate | 03/13/2019 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 03/07/2019 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |