California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SJR5 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 7, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 4, 2019

Chaptered

Bill September 9, 2019

Amended

Bill June 17, 2019
Bill March 13, 2019