|
10/08/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 692, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2021
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 2840.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2021
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2388.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2021
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 26).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2021
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/07/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2021
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
Referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 0. Page 1620.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2021
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2021
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/11/2021
|
Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/11/2021
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/12/2020
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 11.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/11/2020
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|