California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB100 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 11, 2020

Enrolled

Bill September 9, 2021

Chaptered

Bill October 8, 2021

Amended

Bill June 24, 2021
Bill April 5, 2021