|
10/08/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 661, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/15/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2021
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 59. Noes 12. Page 2893.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2021
|
Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 58. Noes 19. Page 2892.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2021
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 58. Noes 19. Page 2892.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2021
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 10 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 2482.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/07/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2021
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 26).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2021
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/15/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/14/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (July 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/05/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2021
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 9. Page 1623.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2021
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2021
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 7).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/24/2021
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/11/2021
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/12/2020
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 11.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/11/2020
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|