California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB101 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 11, 2020

Enrolled

Bill September 10, 2021

Chaptered

Bill October 8, 2021

Amended

Bill September 3, 2021
Bill August 31, 2021
Bill July 15, 2021
Bill July 5, 2021
Bill April 14, 2021