|
09/28/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 354, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2021
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2283.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2021
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/05/2021
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1794.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2021
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2021
|
Referred to Com. on HOUSING.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 17. Page 1892.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2021
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1708.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2021
|
Assembly Rule 69(b) suspended. (Page 1708.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2021
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1577.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 12).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2021
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/04/2021
|
Referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2021
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|