California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1043 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2021

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2021

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2021

Amended

Bill June 1, 2021
Bill May 27, 2021
Bill May 4, 2021