|
09/28/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 379, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2021
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2236.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/14/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 12).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2021
|
Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1816.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E. & R. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/18/2021
|
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2021
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|