California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1048 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2021

Enrolled

Bill September 1, 2021

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2021

Amended

Bill April 20, 2021
Bill March 18, 2021