Senate
|
08/26/2021
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/15/2021
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2021
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2021
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1824.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2021
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2021
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 5).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on E.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/25/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.M. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/04/2021
|
Referred to Com. on E.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2021
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|