Assembly
|
02/01/2022
|
From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/31/2022
|
Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2021
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (April 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2021
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/04/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2021
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|