|
09/30/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 943, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2022
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 1.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2022
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2022
|
Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2022
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 7. Page 5096.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2022
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2022
|
In committee: Set, final hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2021
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2021
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1471.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 12).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2021
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/22/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P., & W. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/04/2021
|
Referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2021
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|